25 | | - | (b) Not later than April 1, 2013, each manufacturer shall, individually or collectively: (1) Establish a mercury thermostat collection and recycling program to collect, transport and properly manage any out-of-service mercury thermostat received at any participating collection site in this state; (2) make a collection container available to any wholesaler, retailer, qualified contractor or municipality that participates as a collection site in such mercury thermostat collection and recycling program and requests such a container; (3) include with each collection container provided to any wholesaler, retailer, qualified contractor or municipality information regarding the proper management of mercury thermostats as universal waste; (4) charge no fee or other charge to any person that participates in such collection and recycling program, except that such manufacturer may charge each wholesaler, retailer, qualified contractor and municipality that participates in such manufacturer's mercury thermostat collection and recycling program and that receives one or more collection containers a one-time program administration fee of not greater than seventy-five dollars; (5) for the period of April 1, 2013, to April 1, 2016, inclusive, conduct educational and outreach efforts concerning such mercury thermostat collection and recycling program, including, but not limited to: (A) Promoting the availability of collection containers to wholesalers, retailers, qualified contractors and municipalities in the state; (B) educating contractors and homeowners on (i) the importance of properly managing out-of-service mercury thermostats, (ii) the opportunities for the collection and recycling of such thermostats, and (iii) the availability of manufacturer mercury thermostat collection and recycling programs; (C) providing signs to participating collection sites to prominently post information for contractors and consumers concerning the collection and recycling of out-of-service mercury thermostats; and (D) supplying written materials, for reproduction by participating wholesalers and retailers, that may be provided to customers at the time of purchase or delivery of a thermostat and that include information on the importance of properly managing out-of-service mercury thermostats and the opportunities for the collection and recycling of such thermostats; and (6) beginning April 1, 2014, and annually thereafter, submit a report to the Department of Energy and Environmental Protection that includes the following information: (A) The number of mercury thermostats collected and recycled by such manufacturer pursuant to such mercury thermostat collection and recycling program during the previous calendar year; (B) a self-evaluation of the effectiveness of such manufacturer's mercury thermostat collection and recycling program that is certified to be substantially accurate by a competent third party who is acceptable to the commissioner; (C) an accounting of the administrative costs incurred by such manufacturer in the course of administering such mercury thermostat collection and recycling program during the previous calendar year; and (D) a list of wholesalers, retailers, qualified contractors and municipalities that requested collection containers from such manufacturer during the previous calendar year. |
---|
| 32 | + | (b) Not later than October 1, 2013, each manufacturer shall, individually or collectively: (1) Establish a mercury thermostat collection and recycling program to collect, transport and properly manage any out-of-service mercury thermostat received at any participating collection site in this state; (2) make a collection container available to any wholesaler, retailer, qualified contractor or municipality that participates as a collection site in such mercury thermostat collection and recycling program and requests such a container; (3) include with each collection container provided to any wholesaler, retailer, qualified contractor or municipality information regarding the proper management of mercury thermostats as universal waste; (4) charge no fee or other charge to any person that participates in such collection and recycling program, except that such manufacturer may charge each wholesaler, retailer, qualified contractor and municipality that participates in such manufacturer's mercury thermostat collection and recycling program and that receives one or more collection containers a one-time program administration fee of not greater than seventy-five dollars; (5) for the period of October 1, 2013, to October 1, 2016, inclusive, conduct educational and outreach efforts concerning such mercury thermostat collection and recycling program, including, but not limited to: (A) Promoting the availability of collection containers to wholesalers, retailers, qualified contractors and municipalities in the state; (B) educating contractors and homeowners on (i) the importance of properly managing out-of-service mercury thermostats, (ii) the opportunities for the collection and recycling of such thermostats, and (iii) the availability of manufacturer mercury thermostat collection and recycling programs; (C) providing signs to participating collection sites to prominently post information for contractors and consumers concerning the collection and recycling of out-of-service mercury thermostats; and (D) supplying written materials, for reproduction by participating wholesalers and retailers, that may be provided to customers at the time of purchase or delivery of a thermostat and that include information on the importance of properly managing out-of-service mercury thermostats and the opportunities for the collection and recycling of such thermostats; and (6) beginning October 1, 2014, and annually thereafter, submit a report to the Department of Energy and Environmental Protection that includes the following information: (A) The number of mercury thermostats collected and recycled by such manufacturer pursuant to such mercury thermostat collection and recycling program during the previous calendar year; (B) a self-evaluation of the effectiveness of such manufacturer's mercury thermostat collection and recycling program; (C) an accounting of the administrative costs incurred by such manufacturer in the course of administering such mercury thermostat collection and recycling program during the previous calendar year; and (D) a list of wholesalers, retailers, qualified contractors and municipalities that requested collection containers from such manufacturer during the previous calendar year. |
---|