04/10/2012 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |||
03/29/2012 | File Number 167 | |||
03/29/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 172 | |||
03/29/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/29/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/23/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/16/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/14/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/08/2012 | Public Hearing 03/12 | |||
03/07/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |