04/17/2012 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/11/2012 | File Number 375 | |||
04/11/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 276 | |||
04/11/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/11/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/04/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/26/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/22/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/09/2012 | Public Hearing 03/13 | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |