|
06/15/2012
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Public Act 12-155
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
House Calendar Number 540
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Amendment Withdrawn, Senate Amendment Schedule D 5289
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 5395
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 5069
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Amendment Withdrawn, Senate Amendment Schedule A 5241
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Matter Pass Retained
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Designated Only Senate Amendment Schedule A 5241
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Environment
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Environment
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
File Number 377
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 282
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/12 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/23/2012
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/16/2012
|
Public Hearing 03/21
|
|
|
|
03/15/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|