Old | New | Differences | |
---|---|---|---|
1 | - | Substitute Senate Bill No. 440 | |
1 | + | General Assembly Substitute Bill No. 440 | |
2 | + | February Session, 2012 *_____SB00440FIN___050312____* | |
2 | 3 | ||
3 | - | Public Act No. 12-155 | |
4 | + | General Assembly | |
5 | + | ||
6 | + | Substitute Bill No. 440 | |
7 | + | ||
8 | + | February Session, 2012 | |
9 | + | ||
10 | + | *_____SB00440FIN___050312____* | |
4 | 11 | ||
5 | 12 | AN ACT CONCERNING PHOSPHOROUS REDUCTION IN STATE WATERS. | |
6 | 13 | ||
7 | 14 | Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened: | |
8 | 15 | ||
9 | - | Section 1. ( | |
16 | + | Section 1. Subdivision (3) of subsection (c) of section 22a-478 of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2012): | |
10 | 17 | ||
11 | - | ||
18 | + | (3) A construction contract eligible for financing awarded by a municipality on or after July 1, 1999, as a project undertaken for nitrogen or phosphorous removal shall receive a project grant of thirty per cent of the cost of the project associated with nitrogen or phosphorous removal, a twenty per cent grant for the balance of the cost of the project not related to nitrogen or phosphorous removal, and a loan for the remainder of the costs of the project, not exceeding one hundred per cent of the eligible water quality project costs. Nitrogen removal projects under design or construction on July 1, 1999, and projects that have been constructed but have not received permanent, Clean Water Fund financing, on July 1, 1999, shall be eligible to receive a project grant of thirty per cent of the cost of the project associated with nitrogen removal, a twenty per cent grant for the balance of the cost of the project not related to nitrogen removal, and a loan for the remainder of the costs of the project, not exceeding one hundred per cent of the eligible water quality project costs. | |
12 | 19 | ||
13 | - | (1) | |
20 | + | Sec. 2. (Effective from passage) The Commissioner of Energy and Environmental Protection, or the commissioner's designee, shall, in consultation with the chief elected officials of the cities of Danbury, Meriden and Waterbury and the towns of Cheshire, Southington and Wallingford, or such chief elected officials' designees, develop a state-wide strategy to reduce phosphorous loading in inland nontidal waters in order to comply with standards established by the United States Environmental Protection Agency. Such state-wide strategy shall (1) establish a state-wide response to address phosphorous nonpoint source pollution, (2) create a workable, cost-effective approach for municipalities to use in order to comply with standards established by the United States Environmental Protection Agency for phosphorous reduction, (3) determine the proper scientific methods by which to measure current phosphorous levels in inland nontidal waters and to make future projections of phosphorous levels in such waters, (4) provide clear guidance to municipal and regional water pollution control authorities as to any capital improvements that may be required to comply with standards established by the United States Environmental Protection Agency for phosphorous reduction, and (5) establish a safe harbor rule for any municipal or regional water pollution control authority that makes capital improvements in reliance on such guidance. The commissioner shall, not later than January 1, 2013, and in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes, submit a report on the state-wide strategy together with recommendations for any legislation required to support such strategy to the joint standing committees of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to local governments and the environment. | |
14 | 21 | ||
15 | - | (2) "Golf course" means an area solely designated for the play or practice of the game of golf, including, but not limited to, surrounding grounds, trees and ornamental beds; and | |
16 | 22 | ||
17 | - | (3) "Impervious surface" means any structure, surface or improvement that reduces or prevents absorption of stormwater into land, including, but not limited to, porous paving, paver blocks, gravel, crushed stone, decks, patios and elevated structures. | |
18 | 23 | ||
19 | - | (b) Notwithstanding chapter 427a of the general statutes, no person shall apply fertilizer, as defined in section 22-111b of the general statutes, any soil amendment, as defined in section 22-111aa of the general statutes, or any compost that contains phosphate to an established lawn, except when: (1) A soil testing method approved by the Commissioner of Agriculture and performed within the previous two years indicates the soil is lacking in phosphorus and fertilizer, soil amendments or compost containing phosphate is needed for the growth of such lawn, or (2) such fertilizer, soil amendment or compost containing phosphate is used for establishing new grass or repairing such lawn with seed or sod. | |
20 | 24 | ||
21 | - | (c) The provisions of this section shall not apply to: (1) Property classified as agricultural land, as defined in section 22-26bb of the general statutes, or (2) a golf course. | |
25 | + | This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections: | |
26 | + | Section 1 October 1, 2012 22a-478(c)(3) | |
27 | + | Sec. 2 from passage New section | |
22 | 28 | ||
23 | - | ||
29 | + | This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections: | |
24 | 30 | ||
25 | - | ||
31 | + | Section 1 | |
26 | 32 | ||
27 | - | ||
33 | + | October 1, 2012 | |
28 | 34 | ||
29 | - | ( | |
35 | + | 22a-478(c)(3) | |
30 | 36 | ||
31 | - | ||
37 | + | Sec. 2 | |
32 | 38 | ||
33 | - | ||
39 | + | from passage | |
34 | 40 | ||
35 | - | ||
41 | + | New section | |
36 | 42 | ||
37 | - | Sec. 3. Subsection (c) of section 22a-478 of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective from passage): | |
38 | 43 | ||
39 | - | (c) The funding of an eligible water quality project shall be pursuant to a project funding agreement between the state, acting by and through the commissioner, and the municipality undertaking such project and shall be evidenced by a project fund obligation or grant account loan obligation, or both, or an interim funding obligation of such municipality issued in accordance with section 22a-479. A project funding agreement shall be in a form prescribed by the commissioner. Eligible water quality projects shall be funded as follows: | |
40 | 44 | ||
41 | - | (1) A nonpoint source pollution abatement project shall receive a project grant of seventy-five per cent of the cost of the project determined to be eligible by the commissioner. | |
45 | + | PD Joint Favorable Subst. | |
46 | + | ENV Joint Favorable | |
47 | + | FIN Joint Favorable | |
42 | 48 | ||
43 | - | ||
49 | + | PD | |
44 | 50 | ||
45 | - | ||
51 | + | Joint Favorable Subst. | |
46 | 52 | ||
47 | - | ||
53 | + | ENV | |
48 | 54 | ||
49 | - | ||
55 | + | Joint Favorable | |
50 | 56 | ||
51 | - | ||
57 | + | FIN | |
52 | 58 | ||
53 | - | (7) Project agreements to fund eligible project costs with grants from the Clean Water Fund that were executed during or after the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2003, shall not be reduced according to the provisions of the regulations adopted under section 22a-482. | |
54 | - | ||
55 | - | (8) On or after July 1, 2002, an eligible water quality project that exclusively addresses sewer collection and conveyance system improvements may receive a loan for one hundred per cent of the eligible costs provided such project does not receive a project grant. Any such sewer collection and conveyance system improvement project shall be rated, ranked, and funded separately from other water pollution control projects and shall be considered only if it is highly consistent with the state's conservation and development plan, or is primarily needed as the most cost effective solution to an existing area-wide pollution problem and incorporates minimal capacity for growth. | |
56 | - | ||
57 | - | (9) All loans made in accordance with the provisions of this section for an eligible water quality project shall bear an interest rate of two per cent per annum. The commissioner may allow any project fund obligation, grant account loan obligation or interim funding obligation for an eligible water quality project to be repaid by a borrowing municipality prior to maturity without penalty. | |
59 | + | Joint Favorable |