04/25/2012 | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development | |||
04/25/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/25/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/25/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/25/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/24/2012 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development | |||
04/16/2012 | File Number 433 | |||
04/16/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 309 | |||
04/09/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/12 10:00 AM | |||
03/16/2012 | Public Hearing 03/20 | |||
03/15/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |