LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2013 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB05106
Action History
CT
Connecticut House Bill HB05106
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2013 Regular Session
Connecticut House Bill HB05106
Action History
House
02/15/2013
Public Hearing 02/19
House
02/05/2013
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
House
01/28/2013
Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Human Services
House
01/28/2013
Change of Reference, House to Committee on Human Services
House
01/25/2013
Change of Reference Human Services
House
01/09/2013
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health