House
|
05/24/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Public Act 13-34
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
File Number 640
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 468
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5978
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
File Number 526
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
House Calendar Number 336
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2013
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2013
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2013
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2013
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2013
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2013
|
Public Hearing 02/19
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2013
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|