Connecticut 2013 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05388 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 16, 2013

Chaptered

Bill May 20, 2013

Comm Sub

Bill April 16, 2013
Bill March 14, 2013
Bill March 6, 2013