Connecticut 2013 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05441 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2013

Chaptered

Bill June 6, 2013

Comm Sub

Bill April 17, 2013
Bill April 4, 2013
Bill March 15, 2013