House
|
07/11/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/19/2013
|
Public Act 13-262
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Matter Pass Retained
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2013
|
File Number 881
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 672
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8056
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
File Number 811
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/13/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
File Number 498
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
House Calendar Number 315
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/13 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2013
|
Public Hearing 03/15
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2013
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2013
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|