Connecticut 2013 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05480 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2013

Chaptered

Bill June 19, 2013

Comm Sub

Bill May 29, 2013
Bill April 15, 2013
Bill March 6, 2013