Connecticut 2013 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05538 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-General Assembly Substitute Bill No. 5538
2-January Session, 2013 *_____HB05538PH____040213____*
1+General Assembly Committee Bill No. 5538
2+January Session, 2013 LCO No. 5153
3+ *05153HB05538PH_*
4+Referred to Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH
5+Introduced by:
6+(PH)
37
48 General Assembly
59
6-Substitute Bill No. 5538
10+Committee Bill No. 5538
711
812 January Session, 2013
913
10-*_____HB05538PH____040213____*
14+LCO No. 5153
1115
12-AN ACT ESTABLISHING A PILOT PROGRAM FOR SCHOOL-BASED HEALTH CARE CENTERS.
16+*05153HB05538PH_*
17+
18+Referred to Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH
19+
20+Introduced by:
21+
22+(PH)
23+
24+AN ACT REQUIRING A REPORT CONCERNING A PILOT PROGRAM FOR SCHOOL-BASED HEALTH CARE CENTERS.
1325
1426 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
1527
16-Section 1. (Effective from passage) (a) Not later than January 1, 2014, the Commissioner of Public Health shall establish a pilot program in five school districts in the state for school-based health centers. Not later than July 1, 2013, said commissioner, in consultation with the Commissioner of Education, shall select the five school districts in which to establish the pilot program. The pilot program may include, but need not be limited to: (1) Extended hours of operation for each school-based health center; (2) the provision of services to students outside the school district in which the school-based health center is located; (3) the provision of behavioral health services and health care services other than those typically provided by school-based health centers; (4) community outreach relating to services provided by the school-based health centers involved in the pilot program; and (5) the receipt of reimbursement for services from private insurance.
28+Section 1. Section 19a-6i of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective from passage):
1729
18-(b) Not later than July 15, 2014, and annually thereafter until termination of the pilot program, the Commissioner of Public Health shall evaluate the pilot program established under subsection (a) of this section and shall submit a report, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes, of the commissioner's findings and recommendations to the joint standing committees of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to public health, education, children and appropriations.
30+(a) There is established a school-based health center advisory committee for the purpose of assisting the Commissioner of Public Health in developing recommendations for statutory and regulatory changes to improve health care through access to school-based health centers.
1931
20-(c) The pilot program established in accordance with this section shall terminate not later than January 1, 2017.
32+(b) The committee shall be composed of the following members:
33+
34+(1) The Commissioner of Public Health, or the commissioner's designee;
35+
36+(2) The Commissioner of Social Services, or the commissioner's designee;
37+
38+(3) The Commissioner of Mental Health and Addiction Services, or the commissioner's designee;
39+
40+(4) The Commissioner of Education, or the commissioner's designee; and
41+
42+(5) Three school-based health center providers who shall be appointed by the board of directors of the Connecticut Association of School-Based Health Centers.
43+
44+(c) The committee shall meet not less than quarterly. On or before January 1, 2012, and annually thereafter, the committee shall report, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a, on its activities to the joint standing committees of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to public health and education.
45+
46+(d) On or before January 1, 2014, the committee shall submit a report, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a, to the joint standing committees of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to public health and education concerning the establishment of a pilot program for school-based health centers. Such report shall include, but need not be limited to, recommendations concerning: (1) The areas or regions to be included in the pilot program; (2) the hours of operation for each school-based health center included in the pilot program; (3) the number and responsibilities of staff persons in such school-based health centers; (4) the number of students and the geographic area to be served by each such school-based health center; (5) the services to be provided by such school-based health centers; (6) community outreach activities relating to such school-based health centers; and (7) payment and reimbursement methods for services provided by such school-based health centers.
47+
48+[(d)] (e) Administrative support for the activities of the committee may be provided by the Connecticut Association of School-Based Health Centers.
49+
50+
2151
2252
2353
2454
2555 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
26-Section 1 from passage New section
56+Section 1 from passage 19a-6i
2757
2858 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
2959
3060 Section 1
3161
3262 from passage
3363
34-New section
64+19a-6i
65+
66+Statement of Purpose:
67+
68+To require the school-based health center advisory committee to submit a report concerning recommendations for a pilot program.
69+
70+[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]
3571
3672
3773
38-PH Joint Favorable Subst.
74+Co-Sponsors: REP. LEMAR, 96th Dist.; REP. MEGNA, 97th Dist. REP. CANDELARIA, 95th Dist.; SEN. HARP, 10th Dist. REP. DILLON, 92nd Dist.; REP. WALKER, 93rd Dist. SEN. LOONEY, 11th Dist.; REP. HOLDER-WINFIELD, 94th Dist. REP. CUEVAS, 75th Dist.; REP. ALBIS, 99th Dist.
3975
40-PH
76+Co-Sponsors:
4177
42-Joint Favorable Subst.
78+REP. LEMAR, 96th Dist.; REP. MEGNA, 97th Dist.
79+
80+REP. CANDELARIA, 95th Dist.; SEN. HARP, 10th Dist.
81+
82+REP. DILLON, 92nd Dist.; REP. WALKER, 93rd Dist.
83+
84+SEN. LOONEY, 11th Dist.; REP. HOLDER-WINFIELD, 94th Dist.
85+
86+REP. CUEVAS, 75th Dist.; REP. ALBIS, 99th Dist.
87+
88+H.B. 5538