Connecticut 2013 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05538 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/17/2013

                            General Assembly  Substitute Bill No. 5538
January Session, 2013  *_____HB05538PH____040213____*

General Assembly

Substitute Bill No. 5538 

January Session, 2013

*_____HB05538PH____040213____*

AN ACT ESTABLISHING A PILOT PROGRAM FOR SCHOOL-BASED HEALTH CARE CENTERS. 

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:

Section 1. (Effective from passage) (a) Not later than January 1, 2014, the Commissioner of Public Health shall establish a pilot program in five school districts in the state for school-based health centers. Not later than July 1, 2013, said commissioner, in consultation with the Commissioner of Education, shall select the five school districts in which to establish the pilot program. The pilot program may include, but need not be limited to: (1) Extended hours of operation for each school-based health center; (2) the provision of services to students outside the school district in which the school-based health center is located; (3) the provision of behavioral health services and health care services other than those typically provided by school-based health centers; (4) community outreach relating to services provided by the school-based health centers involved in the pilot program; and (5) the receipt of reimbursement for services from private insurance.

(b) Not later than July 15, 2014, and annually thereafter until termination of the pilot program, the Commissioner of Public Health shall evaluate the pilot program established under subsection (a) of this section and shall submit a report, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes, of the commissioner's findings and recommendations to the joint standing committees of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to public health, education, children and appropriations.

(c) The pilot program established in accordance with this section shall terminate not later than January 1, 2017.

 


This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
Section 1 from passage New section

This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:

Section 1

from passage

New section

 

PH Joint Favorable Subst.

PH

Joint Favorable Subst.