House | 07/11/2013 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/26/2013 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/26/2013 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/19/2013 | Public Act 13-264 | ||
House | 06/05/2013 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/05/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 04/26/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 464 | ||
House | 04/26/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | File Number 36 | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | House Calendar Number 64 | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/13 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/04/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 01/24/2013 | Public Hearing 01/28 | ||
House | 01/23/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |