LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2013 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB05703
Action History
CT
Connecticut House Bill HB05703
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2013 Regular Session
Connecticut House Bill HB05703
Action History
House
03/06/2013
Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
House
03/05/2013
Drafted by Committee
House
02/28/2013
Vote to Draft
House
02/21/2013
Public Hearing 02/26
House
02/14/2013
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing