LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2013 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB05747
Action History
CT
Connecticut House Bill HB05747
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2013 Regular Session
Connecticut House Bill HB05747
Action History
House
03/19/2013
Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
House
03/18/2013
Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding
House
02/22/2013
Public Hearing 02/27
House
02/15/2013
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
House
02/04/2013
Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting
House
01/23/2013
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health