House
|
06/06/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
Public Act 13-98
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
File Number 823
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 611
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6366
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2013
|
File Number 357
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2013
|
House Calendar Number 236
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2013
|
Public Hearing 03/08
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2013
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2013
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|