House | 04/08/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/05/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations | ||
House | 03/22/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/15/2013 | Public Hearing 02/19 | ||
House | 02/05/2013 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |