House | 05/07/2013 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | File Number 399 | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | House Calendar Number 267 | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/13 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/14/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security | ||
House | 03/13/2013 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/28/2013 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/01/2013 | Public Hearing 02/07 | ||
House | 01/31/2013 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |