House | 04/03/2013 | File Number 325 | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | House Calendar Number 225 | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/15/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/14/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation | ||
House | 03/13/2013 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 03/06/2013 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/21/2013 | Public Hearing 02/25 | ||
House | 02/04/2013 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |