House | 04/15/2013 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/12/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | File Number 326 | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | House Calendar Number 226 | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/14/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation | ||
House | 03/13/2013 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 03/06/2013 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/21/2013 | Public Hearing 02/25 | ||
House | 02/04/2013 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |