House | 03/08/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/01/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/28/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations | ||
House | 02/25/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children | ||
House | 02/22/2013 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/19/2013 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/08/2013 | Public Hearing 02/14 | ||
House | 02/05/2013 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |