House | 03/26/2013 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | File Number 87 | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | House Calendar Number 85 | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/14/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/04/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/21/2013 | Public Hearing 02/25 | ||
House | 02/20/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |