House | 04/05/2013 | Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | File Number 177 | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | House Calendar Number 140 | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/13/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/22/2013 | Public Hearing 02/28 | ||
House | 02/21/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |