House
|
05/23/2013
|
File Number 847
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 642
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 7491
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6185
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Referred by House to Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2013
|
File Number 94
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2013
|
House Calendar Number 92
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2013
|
Public Hearing 02/26
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|