House
|
06/24/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2013
|
Special Act 13-12
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2013
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2013
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
File Number 793
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 569
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6425
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Referred by House to Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
File Number 407
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
House Calendar Number 274
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/13 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2013
|
Public Hearing 03/15
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|