House | 06/04/2013 | Senate Recommitted to Education | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/10/2013 | File Number 794 | ||
House | 05/10/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 572 | ||
House | 05/10/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/08/2013 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/08/2013 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6649 | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | File Number 299 | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | House Calendar Number 209 | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/14/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/13/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/28/2013 | Public Hearing 03/04 | ||
House | 02/27/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |