Connecticut 2013 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06505 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-General Assembly Substitute Bill No. 6505
2-January Session, 2013 *_____HB06505ED____031413____*
1+General Assembly Raised Bill No. 6505
2+January Session, 2013 LCO No. 3613
3+ *03613_______ED_*
4+Referred to Committee on EDUCATION
5+Introduced by:
6+(ED)
37
48 General Assembly
59
6-Substitute Bill No. 6505
10+Raised Bill No. 6505
711
812 January Session, 2013
913
10-*_____HB06505ED____031413____*
14+LCO No. 3613
15+
16+*03613_______ED_*
17+
18+Referred to Committee on EDUCATION
19+
20+Introduced by:
21+
22+(ED)
1123
1224 AN ACT CONCERNING PARAMETERS FOR FEES FOR EXTRACURRICULAR ACTIVITIES AT PUBLIC SCHOOLS.
1325
1426 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
1527
1628 Section 1. Section 10-221 of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2013):
1729
1830 (a) [Boards] Each local and regional board of education shall prescribe rules for the management, studies, classification and discipline of the public schools and, subject to the control of the State Board of Education, the textbooks to be used; shall make rules for the control, within their respective jurisdictions, of school library media centers and approve the selection of books and other educational media therefor, and shall approve plans for public school buildings and superintend any high or graded school in the manner specified in this title.
1931
2032 (b) Not later than July 1, 1985, each local and regional board of education shall develop, adopt and implement written policies concerning homework, attendance, promotion and retention. The Department of Education shall make available model policies and guidelines to assist local and regional boards of education in meeting the responsibilities enumerated in this subsection.
2133
22-(c) [Boards] Each local and regional board of education may prescribe rules to impose sanctions against [pupils] students who damage or fail to return textbooks, library materials or other educational materials. [Said boards] A local or regional board of education may charge [pupils] a student for such damaged or lost textbooks, library materials or other educational materials and may withhold grades, transcripts or report cards until the [pupil] student pays for or returns the textbook, library book or other educational material.
34+(c) [Boards] Each local and regional board of education may prescribe rules to impose sanctions against [pupils] students who damage or fail to return textbooks, library materials or other educational materials. [Said boards] A local or regional board of education may charge [pupils] students for such damaged or lost textbooks, library materials or other educational materials and may withhold grades, transcripts or report cards until the [pupil] student pays for or returns the textbook, library book or other educational material.
2335
2436 (d) Not later than July 1, 1991, each local and regional board of education shall develop, adopt and implement policies and procedures in conformity with section 10-154a for (1) dealing with the use, sale or possession of alcohol or controlled drugs, as defined in subdivision (8) of section 21a-240, by public school students on school property, including a process for coordination with, and referral of such students to, appropriate agencies, and (2) cooperating with law enforcement officials.
2537
2638 (e) Not later than July 1, 1990, each local and regional board of education shall adopt a written policy and procedures for dealing with youth suicide prevention and youth suicide attempts. Each such local and regional board of education may establish a student assistance program to identify risk factors for youth suicide, procedures to intervene with such youths, referral services and training for teachers and other school professionals and students who provide assistance in the program.
2739
2840 (f) Not later than September 1, 1998, each local and regional board of education shall develop, adopt and implement written policies and procedures to encourage parent-teacher communication. These policies and procedures may include monthly newsletters, required regular contact with all parents, flexible parent-teacher conferences, drop-in hours for parents, home visits and the use of technology such as homework hot lines to allow parents to check on their children's assignments and students to get assistance if needed. For the school year commencing July 1, 2010, and each school year thereafter, such policies and procedures shall require the district to conduct two flexible parent-teacher conferences for each school year.
2941
30-(g) A local or regional board of education may develop a student activity fee exemption policy for students who demonstrate an inability to pay a student activity fee charged by the local or regional board of education for participation in any extracurricular activity. Such policy shall include, but not be limited to, the criteria and standards for determining who is eligible for a student activity fee exemption and a list of the student activity fees and extracurricular activities to which such exemptions apply. If no such student activity fee exemption policy exists for a local or regional board of education, such local or regional board of education shall not charge a student activity fee to a student for participation in any extracurricular activity who demonstrates an inability to pay such student activity fee.
42+(g) (1) Except as otherwise provided in section 10-266t, no local or regional board of education shall (A) charge a student activity fee to any student who does not participate in any extracurricular activity, if the proceeds of such student activity fee are used to fund any such extracurricular activity, or (B) charge more than fifty dollars for each interscholastic or intramural athletic activity offered by the school or school district, provided no local or regional board of education shall charge more than two hundred dollars in a school year to a family for student participation in interscholastic or intramural athletics offered by the school or school district.
43+
44+(2) A local or regional board of education may develop a student activity fee exemption policy for students who demonstrate an inability to pay a student activity fee charged by the local or regional board of education for participation in any extracurricular activity. Such policy shall include, but not be limited to, the criteria and standards for determining who is eligible for a student activity fee exemption and a list of the student activity fees and extracurricular activities to which such exemptions apply. If no such student activity fee exemption policy exists for a local or regional board of education, such local or regional board of education shall not charge a student activity fee to a student for participation in any extracurricular activity who demonstrates an inability to pay such student activity fee.
3145
3246
3347
3448
3549 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
3650 Section 1 July 1, 2013 10-221
3751
3852 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
3953
4054 Section 1
4155
4256 July 1, 2013
4357
4458 10-221
4559
60+Statement of Purpose:
4661
62+To prohibit local and regional boards of education from charging fees to students who do not participate in any extracurricular activities; to limit the amount local and regional boards of education can charge for participation in athletic activities; to permit local and regional boards of education to develop student activity fee exemption policies; and to prohibit local and regional boards of education from charging any student activity fees to students who are unable to pay such fees.
4763
48-ED Joint Favorable Subst.
49-
50-ED
51-
52-Joint Favorable Subst.
64+[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]