House | 04/02/2013 | File Number 300 | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | House Calendar Number 210 | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/15/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/14/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/27/2013 | Public Hearing 03/07 | ||
House | 02/27/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Program Review and Investigations |