House
|
06/21/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2013
|
Public Act 13-173
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2013
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2013
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
File Number 848
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 643
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7387
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Referred by House to Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Education
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2013
|
Referred by House to Committee on Education
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
File Number 227
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
House Calendar Number 170
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2013
|
Public Hearing 03/05
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Children
|
|
|