Connecticut 2013 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06525 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2013

Chaptered

Bill June 6, 2013

Comm Sub

Bill April 24, 2013
Bill April 10, 2013
Bill March 27, 2013