Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2013
|
Public Act 13-202
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 686
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
File Number 464
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
House Calendar Number 300
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2013
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2013
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2013
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2013
|
Public Hearing 03/07
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
|
|
|