LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2013 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB06528
Draft Versions
CT
Connecticut House Bill HB06528
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2013 Regular Session
Connecticut House Bill HB06528
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 27, 2013
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
June 11, 2013
Compare
Comm Sub
Bill
May 29, 2013
Compare
Bill
May 1, 2013
Compare
Bill
April 11, 2013
Compare
Bill
March 19, 2013
Compare