House
|
05/28/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Special Act 13-3
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
File Number 644
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 469
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6139
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
File Number 550
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
House Calendar Number 349
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2013
|
Public Hearing 03/18
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|