House | 03/22/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/08/2013 | Public Hearing 03/12 | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |