Connecticut 2013 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06600 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 General Assembly Raised Bill No. 6600
22 January Session, 2013 LCO No. 4232
3- *_____HB06600CE_FIN032013____*
3+ *04232_______CE_*
44 Referred to Committee on COMMERCE
55 Introduced by:
66 (CE)
77
88 General Assembly
99
1010 Raised Bill No. 6600
1111
1212 January Session, 2013
1313
1414 LCO No. 4232
1515
16-*_____HB06600CE_FIN032013____*
16+*04232_______CE_*
1717
1818 Referred to Committee on COMMERCE
1919
2020 Introduced by:
2121
2222 (CE)
2323
2424 AN ACT CONCERNING A PILOT PROGRAM FOR THE TAXATION OF PASS-THROUGH ENTITIES IN THE MANUFACTURING, BIOSCIENCE, AND ALLIED HEALTH FIELDS.
2525
2626 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
2727
2828 Section 1. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2013, and applicable to taxable years commencing on or after January 1, 2013) (a) As used in this section:
2929
3030 (1) "Department" means the Department of Economic and Community Development;
3131
3232 (2) "Partner" means (A) a partner, as defined in Section 7701(a)(2) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, or any subsequent corresponding internal revenue code of the United States, as amended from time to time, and any reference to a partner in this section shall include a member of a limited liability company that is treated as a partnership for federal income tax purposes, or (B) an individual shareholder of an S corporation; and
3333
3434 (3) "Qualified business" means a business in the manufacturing, bioscience or allied health field that is treated as a partnership or S corporation for federal income tax purposes.
3535
3636 (b) (1) The Department of Economic and Community Development shall administer a system of tax rate vouchers for the partners of qualified businesses in the state in accordance with the provisions of this section.
3737
3838 (2) (A) For the taxable year commencing on January 1, 2013, a partner of a qualified business shall be eligible for a tax rate voucher that provides a reduction of one-half of one per cent in such partner's marginal rate of tax under section 12-700 of the general statutes.
3939
4040 (B) For the taxable year commencing on January 1, 2014, a partner of a qualified business shall be eligible for a tax rate voucher that provides a reduction of one per cent in such partner's marginal rate of tax under section 12-700 of the general statutes.
4141
4242 (C) For the taxable year commencing on January 1, 2015, a partner of a qualified business shall be eligible for a tax rate voucher that provides a reduction of one and one-half per cent in such partner's marginal rate of tax pursuant to section 12-700 of the general statutes.
4343
4444 (D) For the taxable year commencing on January 1, 2016, a partner of a qualified business shall be eligible for a tax rate voucher that provides a reduction of two per cent in such partner's marginal rate of tax under section 12-700 of the general statutes.
4545
4646 (c) A partner of a qualified business may apply to the Department of Economic and Community Development for a tax rate voucher on an annual basis, and shall provide with such application such information as the department may require to determine such partner's eligibility to receive a voucher pursuant to this section. The department shall charge a reasonable administrative fee sufficient to cover the department's costs to analyze applications submitted under this section.
4747
4848 (d) The Commissioner of Revenue Services shall reduce the marginal rate of tax under section 12-700 of the general statutes of a partner holding the tax credit voucher issued pursuant to subsections (b) and (c) of this section by the percentage specified in the voucher for the tax year in which the tax rate voucher is issued. The Department of Economic and Community Development shall provide a copy of the voucher to the Commissioner of Revenue Services upon the request of the commissioner.
4949
5050 (e) The Department of Economic and Community Development may, in consultation with the Commissioner of Revenue Services, adopt regulations, in accordance with chapter 54 of the general statutes, to carry out the purposes of this section.
5151
5252
5353
5454
5555 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
5656 Section 1 July 1, 2013, and applicable to taxable years commencing on or after January 1, 2013 New section
5757
5858 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
5959
6060 Section 1
6161
6262 July 1, 2013, and applicable to taxable years commencing on or after January 1, 2013
6363
6464 New section
6565
66+Statement of Purpose:
6667
68+To establish a pilot program providing a reduction in the tax rate of pass-through entities in the manufacturing, bioscience and allied health fields.
6769
68-CE Joint Favorable C/R FIN
69-
70-CE
71-
72-Joint Favorable C/R
73-
74-FIN
70+[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]