House | 06/04/2013 | Senate Recommitted to Education | ||
House | 06/03/2013 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 581 | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | File Number 470 | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | House Calendar Number 306 | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/05/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/22/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Public Hearing 03/15 | ||
House | 03/08/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |