House | 05/06/2013 | File Number 726 | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | House Calendar Number 506 | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/06/13 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/19/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/19/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Public Hearing 04/05 | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |