House
|
06/04/2013
|
Senate Recommitted to Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
File Number 867
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 657
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7444
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Environment
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Referred by House to Committee on Environment
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
File Number 698
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
House Calendar Number 481
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/01/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2013
|
Public Hearing 04/05
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|