Senate | 04/25/2013 | House Calendar Number 434 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 03/28/2013 | File Number 240 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 199 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/28/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/22/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/14/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/14/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Banks | ||
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/19/2013 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/07/2013 | Public Hearing 02/14 | ||
Senate | 01/31/2013 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |