LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2013 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB00352
Action History
CT
Connecticut Senate Bill SB00352
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2013 Regular Session
Connecticut Senate Bill SB00352
Action History
Senate
02/22/2013
Public Hearing 02/27
Senate
02/15/2013
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
Senate
02/04/2013
Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Health
Senate
02/04/2013
Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Health
Senate
02/01/2013
Change of Reference Public Health
Senate
01/23/2013
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development