Senate | 06/04/2013 | Senate Recommitted to Public Health | ||
Senate | 05/28/2013 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | File Number 759 | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/07/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | File Number 411 | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 290 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/14/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | Public Hearing 02/27 | ||
Senate | 02/15/2013 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |