Senate | 06/04/2013 | Senate Recommitted to Energy and Technology | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | File Number 414 | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 291 | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/22/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/15/2013 | Public Hearing 02/21 | ||
Senate | 02/05/2013 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |