Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
House Calendar Number 624
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7455
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
File Number 604
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
New File by Committee on General Law
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2013
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on General Law
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
File Number 99
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 134
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2013
|
Public Hearing 02/15
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|