Senate | 06/04/2013 | Senate Recommitted to Planning and Development | ||
Senate | 06/03/2013 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/03/2013 | No New File by Committee on Energy and Technology | ||
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Energy and Technology | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | File Number 560 | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 410 | ||
Senate | 04/12/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/01/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |