Senate | 05/14/2013 | File Number 814 | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/13/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | File Number 260 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 231 | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 02/28/2013 | Public Hearing 03/04 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |