Senate | 04/24/2013 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | File Number 437 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 299 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/05/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/22/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/11/2013 | Public Hearing 02/15 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |