Senate | 05/03/2013 | No New File by Committee on Human Services | ||
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Human Services | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | No New File by Committee on Public Health | ||
Senate | 04/12/2013 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Health | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | File Number 69 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 115 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | Public Hearing 02/26 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |