Connecticut 2013 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00937 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/03/2013

                            General Assembly  Substitute Bill No. 937
January Session, 2013  *_____SB00937HS____050213____*

General Assembly

Substitute Bill No. 937 

January Session, 2013

*_____SB00937HS____050213____*

AN ACT CONCERNING CARE FOR ELDERLY PERSONS IN A HOME SETTING RATHER THAN A NURSING HOME FACILITY. 

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:

Section 1. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2013) (a) For purposes of this section, (1) "elderly person" means a person sixty years of age or older, and (2) "nursing home facility" has the same meaning as provided in section 19a-521 of the general statutes.

(b) The Commissioner of Social Services, in consultation with the Commissioner of Public Health, shall develop a plan to ensure that, on and after January 1, 2016, not less than seventy-five per cent of elderly persons who require long-term care shall receive such care in a home setting rather than a nursing home facility.

(c) Not later than October 1, 2013, the Commissioner of Social Services, in consultation with the Commissioner of Public Health, shall conduct a study that identifies: (1) The number of elderly persons in this state projected to be in need of long-term care on and after January 1, 2016; (2) the projected percentage of persons identified in subdivision (1) of this subsection who would be deemed functionally capable of receiving long-term care in a home setting; (3) federal and state funds projected to be available to support such care on and after January 1, 2016; (4) projected savings from providing such care in a home setting rather than a nursing home facility for seventy-five per cent of those requiring such care; (5) labor force changes needed to provide such care; and (6) the impact on nursing home facilities.

(d) Not later than October 1, 2013, the Commissioner of Social Services, in consultation with the Commissioner of Public Health, shall convene a working group which includes, but is not limited to: (1) Elderly persons who are long-term care consumers or their representatives; (2) representatives of home care providers; (3) representatives of for-profit and not-for-profit nursing home facilities; and (4) Department of Social Services and Department of Public Health staff who oversee long-term care services and regulations.

(e) Not later than December 31, 2014, the Commissioner of Social Services, in consultation with the Commissioner of Public Health, shall present the plan described in subsection (b) of this section to the joint standing committees of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to aging, human services and public health.

 


This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
Section 1 July 1, 2013 New section

This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:

Section 1

July 1, 2013

New section

 

AGE Joint Favorable Subst. -LCO
PH Joint Favorable
HS Joint Favorable

AGE

Joint Favorable Subst. -LCO

PH

Joint Favorable

HS

Joint Favorable